CA AB21 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 13337 of the Government Code, relating to state fiscal affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Budget: key liabilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-01 Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2011-01-24 Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2010-12-07 From printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
2010-12-06 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code13337Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback