CA AB21 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 399.12 of, and repeal and add Section 399.15 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renewable energy resources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-09-12 - Assembly - AB 21 KREKORIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-12 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB21 Krekorian By Simitian (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Assembly - AB 21 LOWENTHAL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-14 Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
2009-10-26 Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2009-10-11 Vetoed by Governor.
2009-09-29 Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2009-09-12 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 3417.)
2009-09-12 Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Ayes 21. Noes 10. Page 2461.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 10. Page 2462.)
2009-09-04 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2009-06-11 Referred to Com. on RLS.
2009-06-02 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2009-06-01 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 1824.)
2009-05-29 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
2009-04-29 In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2009-04-15 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 14).
2009-04-13 Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2009-04-02 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
2009-03-25 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 25).
2009-03-19 Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2009-03-18 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
2009-02-19 Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2009-02-18 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
2009-02-05 Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and E.S. & T.M.
2008-12-02 From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
2008-12-01 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code399.12Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code399.15New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_21&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_bill_20081201_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_bill_20090218_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_bill_20090318_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_bill_20090402_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_bill_20090904_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_bill_20090912_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_bill_20090921_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_vote_20090325_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_vote_20090414_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_vote_20090528_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_vote_20090601_1230PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_vote_20090912_0531AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_21_vote_20090912_0604AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback