CA AB2093 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 69519.5 to the Education Code, relating to first responders.
Title
First responders: loan forgiveness program.
Sponsors
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Asm. Heath Flora [R] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69519.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |