CA AB2092 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 711 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Energy: small modular reactors: feasibility study.
Sponsors
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Asm. Juan Alanis [R] | Asm. Diane Dixon [R] | Asm. Joe Patterson [R] |
Sen. Roger Niello [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 13). |
2024-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 711 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |