CA AB209 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 675, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 675, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 1.26 (commencing with Section 5090.75) to Division 5 of the Public Resources Code, relating to parks.
Title
Parks: outdoor environmental education: grant program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 209 Limón Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB209 Limón et al. By Caballero (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 209 Limón Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB209 Limón et al. By Caballero (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 209 Limón Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 675, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 3095.). |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 2507.). |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9). |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 1859.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 16). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 14. |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 5090.75 | New Code | See Bill Text |