CA AB2085 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 42008.7 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: misdemeanor violations: amnesty.
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Fox [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and TRANS. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 42008.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |