CA AB2078 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2016 - 50% progression
Action: 2016-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 166 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protective orders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-01 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - AB 2078 KIM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-11SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2016-08-01SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2016-06-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2016-05-27SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2016-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4956.)
2016-05-19AssemblyFrom Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
2016-05-12AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2016-05-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 11).
2016-04-13AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2016-03-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-02-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2016-02-18AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2016-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code166Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback