CA AB2077 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2830.5 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity: local government renewable energy self-generation program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2018-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2827 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2830 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2830.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |