CA AB2068 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 748, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 748, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend and repeal Section 5002.8 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: license plates: legislative and congressional
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Cannella [R] | Asm. Paul Cook [R] | Sen. Robert Dutton [R] | Asm. Kevin Jeffries [R] |
Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Sen. Michael Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-22 - Assembly - AB 2068 PORTANTINO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2068 Portantino By Rubio (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2068 PORTANTINO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2068 Portantino By Rubio (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2068 PORTANTINO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 748, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-22 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6106.). | |
2012-08-20 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-20 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4587.). | |
2012-08-15 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-14 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-07 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-06-26 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 19). | |
2012-06-07 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2012-05-25 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-25 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4980.) | |
2012-05-21 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4924.) | |
2012-05-17 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 16). | |
2012-04-17 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-09 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 5002.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |