CA AB2065 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 17276.24 and 24416.24 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Income taxes: net operating losses: businesses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17276.24 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 24416.24 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |