CA AB2064 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8570.3 of the Government Code, relating to emergency planning.
Title
Emergency preparedness: access and functional needs.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Patterson [R] | Sen. Ling Ling Chang [R] | Asm. Vince Fong [R] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8570.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |