CA AB2063 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-25 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-25 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65915 of the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Density bonuses: affordable housing impact fees.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Berman [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20). |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65915 | Amended Code | Citation Text |