CA AB205 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 61, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 61, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 13 (commencing with Section 16429.8) to Chapter 2 of Part 2 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 25403.2 and 25806 of, to add Chapter 6.2 (commencing with Section 25545), Chapter 7.4 (commencing with Section 25640), and Chapter 8.9 (commencing with Section 25790) to Division 15 of, and to add and repeal Section 25216.8 of, the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 381, 739.1, 739.9, and 2827.1 of the Public Utilities Code, to add and repeal Section 17131.20 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to add Division 29 (commencing with Section 80700) to the Water Code, relating to energy, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Energy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Assembly - AB 205 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 64 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB205 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 205 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB205 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 205 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 61, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-06-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-06-29 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 p.m. | |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 13.). |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 4526.). |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (June 27). |
2022-06-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2022-06-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 514.) |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16429.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 25216.8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 25403.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 25545 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 25640 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 25790 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 25806 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2827.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 381 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 739.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 739.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17131.20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 80700 | New Code | See Bill Text |