CA AB2049 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-06 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-06 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 45168 and 88167 of the Education Code, relating to school and community college employees.
Title
Classified school and community college employees: payroll deductions for employee organization dues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2049 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2049 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 5401.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25). |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P.E., R., & S.S. and HIGHER ED. |
2018-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 45109 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 45168 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 88167 | Amended Code | Citation Text |