CA AB2048 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6591.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
State Board of Equalization: administration: interest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2012-05-02 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-04-24 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (February 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-16 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |
2012-04-10 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2012-04-09 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6591.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |