CA AB2046 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 817, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 817, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 62.5 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Property taxation: change in ownership: exclusion:
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2046 Allen By Leno (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2046 ALLEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2046 ALLEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 817, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m. | |
2012-08-28 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2012-08-27 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 4869.). | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-06 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-07-05 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-14 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-06-04 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 25. Page 5179.) | |
2012-05-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-22 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-21 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-05-17 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 14). | |
2012-05-08 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |
2012-04-16 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-15 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 62.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |