CA AB2043 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 768, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 768, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 1800, 1801, 1802, 1802.1, 1810.7, 1810.8, 1811, and 1815 of, and to add Section 1802.3 to, the Insurance Code, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 1299.01, 1299.02, and 1299.04 of the Penal Code, relating to bail bonds.
Title
Bail bonds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2043 Jones-Sawyer Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2043 Jones-Sawyer et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2043 Jones-Sawyer Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2043 Jones-Sawyer et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2043 Jones-Sawyer Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 768, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 3.). |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 5100.). |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2022-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on INS. and PUB. S. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 8.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | (pending re-refer to Com. on INS.) |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4251.) |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4251.) |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and INS. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 1800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1801 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1802 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1802.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1810.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1810.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1811 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1815 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1299.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1299.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1299.04 | New Code | See Bill Text |