CA AB2041 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 723, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 723, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11346.5 of the Government Code, relating to regulations.
Title
Regulations: adoption: disability access.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2041 SWANSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2041 Swanson By De León (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2041 SWANSON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2041 Swanson By De León (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2041 SWANSON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 723, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-29 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6512.). | |
2012-08-28 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-27 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4869.). | |
2012-08-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-15 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-09 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-07 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-06-26 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-12 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2012-05-10 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-10 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4785.) | |
2012-05-03 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-05-02 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2). | |
2012-04-18 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11346.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |