CA AB2039 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17072 of, and to add and repeal Section 17208 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Personal income taxes: deductions: CalABLE contributions.
Sponsors
Asm. Vince Fong [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (March 19). |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17072 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17208 | New Code | See Bill Text |