CA AB2030 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-28 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-28 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 2.2 (commencing with Section 1301) of Chapter 5 of Part 1 of Division 1 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment insurance, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Unemployment: Self-Employment Assistance Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-07 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2010-05-05 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-21 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 5.) (April 21). | |
2010-04-13 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |
2010-04-12 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-07 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2010-03-23 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |
2010-03-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |
2010-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2010-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |