CA AB2021 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Privacy and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Privacy and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17591, 17592, and 17593 of, and to amend the heading of Article 8 (commencing with Section 17590) of Chapter 1 of Part 3 of Division 7 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to solicitations.
Title
Solicitations: do not contact list.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 17591 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 17592 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 17593 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2021 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2021 |