CA AB2019 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-28 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-28 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the heading of Article 16 (commencing with Section 8561) of Chapter 2 of Part 3 of Division 6 of, and to amend and repeal Sections 8568, 8568.5, 8573, 8574, 8575, and 8575.5 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 8561, 8563, 8564, 8567, 8569, 8576, 8576.5, 8577, 8579, and 8582 of, and to add Sections 8561.1 and 8561.3 to, the Fish and Game Code, relating to commercial fishing.
Title
Commercial fishing: drift gill net shark and swordfish fishery.
Sponsors
Asm. Paul Fong [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] |
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] | Asm. Das Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Assembly | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 8561 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8563 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8564 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8567 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8568 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8568.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8569 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8573 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8574 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8575 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8575.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8576 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8576.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8577 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8579 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8582 | New Code | See Bill Text |