CA AB2018 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 128552 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 5822 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Mental health workforce planning: loan forgiveness, loan repayment, and scholarship programs.
Sponsors
Asm. Brian Maienschein [D] | Asm. Vince Fong [R] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Asm. Randy Voepel [R] |
Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Assembly - AB 2018 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Assembly - AB 2018 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 6). |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5004.) |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 3). |
2018-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2018-02-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-02-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 128552 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 128553 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5822 | Amended Code | Citation Text |