CA AB2016 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 69433.3 to the Education Code, relating to student financial aid.
Title
Student financial aid: Student Aid Commission: total cost of attendance calculator.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 29. |
2020-01-29 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69433.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2016 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2016 |