CA AB2016 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on September 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 327, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on September 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 327, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 51226.7 to the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Pupil instruction: ethnic studies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-23 - Assembly - AB 2016 ALEJO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2016 Alejo By Hall (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2016 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2016 Alejo By Hall (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2016 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 327, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 13. Page 6144.). |
2016-08-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 5067.). |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5166.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 7. Page 5171.) |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (May 27). |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 13). |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51226.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |