CA AB2014 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 803 of the Penal Code, relating to medical misconduct.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical misconduct: misuse of sperm, ova, or embryos: statute of limitations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2014 Maienschein Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-06-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.)
2020-05-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-05-26AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2020-05-26AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2020-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-05-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2020-03-17AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-03-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-03-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-03-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2020-02-14AssemblyReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
2020-01-30AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 29.
2020-01-29AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code803Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback