CA AB2014 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 20001 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicle accidents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle accidents: fleeing the scene of an accident.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
2018-04-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-11AssemblyFurther hearing to be set.
2018-04-11AssemblyIn committee: Hearing for testimony only.
2018-04-03AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-20AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-02-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-06AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
2018-02-05AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code20001Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback