CA AB2013 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 6254 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 293 of, and to add Section 186.37 to, the Penal Code, relating to crimes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes: public records: disclosure of information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2018-04-25AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-16AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 10).
2018-04-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-05AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 3).
2018-02-12AssemblyReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
2018-02-06AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
2018-02-05AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code6254Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code186.37New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code293Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback