CA AB2010 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held without recommendation.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held without recommendation.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 208.4 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juvenile facilities.
Title
Juvenile facilities: chemical agents.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held without recommendation. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 208.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2010 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2010 |