CA AB201 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 555, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 555, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 84502 of, and to add Section 84504.7 to, the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: campaign disclosure: text messages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-13 - Assembly - AB 201 Cervantes Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB201 Cervantes et al. By Allen (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 201 Cervantes Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB201 Cervantes et al. By Allen (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 201 Cervantes Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 555, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 3567.). |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 13). |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3461.) |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 2836.). |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-31 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 2). |
2019-06-18 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1828.) |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 14. |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 84502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84504.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |