CA AB201 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 290.03 of the Penal Code, relating to registered sex offenders.
Title
Registered sex offenders: local ordinances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2016-01-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and PUB. S. |
2015-01-30 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 290.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |