CA AB201 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-05 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-05 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 2.97 (commencing with Section 1001.95) to Title 6 of Part 2 of the Penal Code, relating to veterans courts.
Title
Veterans courts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-07-11 - Senate - Special Consent #6 AB201 Butler (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Assembly - AB 201 BUTLER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Assembly - AB 201 BUTLER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-05 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2011-07-25 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2011-07-11 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-07-11 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1788.). | |
2011-07-06 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2011-06-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). | |
2011-06-15 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Coms. on V.A. and PUB. S. | |
2011-05-05 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-05 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1231.) | |
2011-04-14 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-13 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 12). | |
2011-03-22 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-01-28 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 27. | |
2011-01-27 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1001.95 | New Code | See Bill Text |