CA AB2009 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-03 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-03 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 20111 and 20114 of, and to add Section 20114.1 to, the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
School districts: public contracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 20111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20114 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20114.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |