CA AB2009 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 646, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 646, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 35179.4 and 35179.6 to the Education Code, relating to interscholastic athletic programs.
Title
Interscholastic athletic programs: school districts: written emergency action plans: automated external defibrillator.
Sponsors
Asm. Brian Maienschein [D] | Asm. Dante Acosta [R] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] |
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2009 MAIENSCHEIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2009 Maienschein et al. By Stern (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - AB 2009 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2009 Maienschein et al. By Stern (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - AB 2009 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 646, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 7013.). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5964.). |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-06-11 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED., JUD. and APPR. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4646.) |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 3). |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-03-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. |
2018-02-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 35179.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 35179.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |