CA AB2008 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 290.017 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Crimes: sex offender registration: notice of duty to register.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 290.017 | Amended Code | Citation Text |