CA AB2006 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 364, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 364, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 44258.4 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to vehicular air pollution.
Title
Charge Ahead California Initiative: agricultural worker vanpool programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Sen. Anna Caballero [D] | Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] |
Sen. Monique Limon [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-20 - Assembly - AB 2006 EGGMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2006 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2006 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2006 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2006 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 364, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6352.). |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5280.). |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and EQ. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5526.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25). |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 16). |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES. |
2018-02-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 44258.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44269 | New Code | See Bill Text |