CA AB2004 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-09-15 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 11546.10 to the Government Code, relating to privacy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical test results: verification credentials.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2004 CALDERON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2004 Calderon et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2004 Calderon Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-15AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2020-08-31AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 67. Noes 0.)
2020-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-31SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2020-08-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-28SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-08-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 20).
2020-08-13SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-08-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-02SenateRe-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2020-06-29SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-06-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 1.)
2020-06-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 2).
2020-05-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
2020-05-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-05-12AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-05-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 5).
2020-03-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2020-03-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
2020-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2020-01-29AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
2020-01-28AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code11546.10New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback