CA AB2004 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 72, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 31570) to Chapter 3 of Part 3 of Division 4 of Title 3 of the Government Code, relating to public employee retirement, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Big Bear Fire Agencies Pension Consolidation Act of 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2004 Obernolte Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Assembly - AB 2004 OBERNOLTE Third Reading Urgency (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 72, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-09 Approved by the Governor.
2018-06-26AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-06-18AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-06-18SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4732.).
2018-06-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 11).
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2018-03-22SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-03-22AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4372.).
2018-03-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-03-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 14).
2018-02-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
2018-02-02AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
2018-02-01AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code31570New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback