CA AB2002 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 82002, 82039, and 86300 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 30324 and 30325 of the Public Resources Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: California Coastal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2002 Mark Stone By Allen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2002 Mark Stone By Allen (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Natural Resources and Water (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2002 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2002 Mark Stone By Allen (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Natural Resources and Water (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2002 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on Senate inactive file. |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 5575.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Allen. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5575.) Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Allen. |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5510.) Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and N.R. & W. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 5247.) |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 27). |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and NAT. RES. |
2016-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 82002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 82039 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 86300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 30324 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 30325 | Amended Code | Citation Text |