CA AB2001 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8245 and 8246 of, and to add Sections 8248 and 8249 to, the Education Code, relating to child care.
Title
Family child care home education networks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Assembly - AB 2001 REYES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 17 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Assembly - AB 2001 REYES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 17 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 17. Page 4781.) |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 4). |
2018-03-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2018-02-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 8245 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8246 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8248 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 8249 | New Code | See Bill Text |