CA AB2000 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 483, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 25503.6 and 25503.8 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages: tied-house restrictions: advertising.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2000 KALRA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2000 Kalra et al. By Wieckowski (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 2000 KALRA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-18 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 483, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-18 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6977.).
2018-08-28AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 28).
2018-08-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-22SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5593.).
2018-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-18SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-05-10SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-04-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4899.)
2018-04-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18).
2018-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-15AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-03-14AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
2018-02-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-02-02AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
2018-02-01AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code25503.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25503.8Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback