CA AB2 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3455 of, and to add Section 3005 to, the Penal Code, relating to sex offenders.
Title
Sex offenders: parole violations.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Morrell [R] | Asm. Connie Conway [R] | Asm. Beth Gaines [R] | Asm. Jeff Gorell [R] |
Asm. Diane Harkey [R] | Sen. Brian Jones [R] | Asm. Brian Nestande [R] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2014-01-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Reconsideration granted. |
2013-03-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2012-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2012-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 3005 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 3455 | Amended Code | Citation Text |