CA AB2 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 1389.9, 1389.10, 1389.11, 1389.13, 1389.14, 1389.15, 1389.16, 1389.17, 1389.18, 1389.19, 1389.20, 1389.22, and 1389.24 to, and to repeal and add Section 1389.1 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 10270.95, 10291.5, and 12957 of, and to add Sections 10384.1, 10384.12, 10384.14, 10384.16, 10384.18, 10384.2, 10384.22, 10384.24, 10384.26, 10384.28, 10384.29, 10384.3, 10384.32, and 10396 to, the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Individual health care coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-10 - Assembly - AB2 DE LA TORRE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2 De La Torre By Florez (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Assembly - AB2 DE LA TORRE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 26 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2 De La Torre By Florez (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Assembly - AB2 DE LA TORRE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 26 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-14 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2009-10-26 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2009-10-11 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2009-09-25 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2009-09-10 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 3282.) | |
2009-09-09 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |
2009-09-08 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 2292.) | |
2009-09-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-31 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 27). (received by desk August 28, 2009 pursuant to JR61(a)(11)) | |
2009-08-17 | In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-23 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 14). Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-09 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (July 8). | |
2009-07-01 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-18 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. | |
2009-06-04 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-03 | Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 26. Page 2069.) | |
2009-06-02 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-06-01 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). | |
2009-05-13 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-04-29 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (April 28). | |
2009-04-21 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-04-20 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-14 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-02-05 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2008-12-02 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 1. | |
2008-12-01 | Read first time. To print. |