CA AB1999 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 963, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 25213, 53395.3.2, 53398.52, and 61100 of, and to add Article 12 (commencing with Section 53167) to Chapter 1 of Part 1 of Division 2 of Title 5 of, the Government Code, and to add Sections 10001.5, 12801.5, and 16461.10 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government: public broadband services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1999 CHAU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1999 Chau By McGuire (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Assembly - AB 1999 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Communications and Conveyance] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 963, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-06AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 22. Page 6888.).
2018-08-29AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6773.)
2018-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-28SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 4. Page 5882.).
2018-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-23SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-07-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E., U. & C.
2018-05-22SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-21AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 20. Page 5242.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (May 9).
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
2018-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-04-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2018-02-12AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and C. & C.
2018-02-02AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
2018-02-01AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code25213Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53167New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code53395.3.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53398.52Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code61100Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code61105Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code10001.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code12801.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code16461.10New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback