CA AB1998 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 11153.1 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opioids: safe prescribing policy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1998 RODRIGUEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-07-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-19SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH.
2018-05-31SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5525.)
2018-05-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-05-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-04-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-03AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-03-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-03-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2018-02-12AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P.
2018-02-02AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
2018-02-01AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code11153.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code11154.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code11158Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code11190Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback