CA AB1997 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 612, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 612, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 48204, 48853, 56155.5, and 79420 of the Education Code, to amend Sections 6552, 7911, 7911.1, 7912, 8712, and 9201 of, and to add Section 9203.1 to, the Family Code, to amend Section 30029.7 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 1501.1, 1502, 1502.4, 1506, 1506.1, 1506.3, 1506.5, 1506.6, 1506.7, 1506.8, 1507.25, 1517, 1520.1, 1522.2, 1522.4, 1522.41, 1522.43, 1522.44, 1523.1, 1524.6, 1525.5, 1530.7, 1530.8, 1531.1, 1531.15, 1534, 1536, 1538.3, 1538.5, 1538.6, 1538.7, 1538.8, 1538.9, 1548, 1562, 1562.01, 1562.35, 1563, and 1567.4 of, and to add Sections 1517.1, 1517.2, and 1517.3 to, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 676.7 of the Insurance Code, to amend Section 11165.7 of the Penal Code, to amend Sections 1541 and 1543 of the Probate Code, and to amend Sections 291, 293, 294, 295, 309, 319.3, 361.2, 361.3, 361.4, 361.45, 361.5, 366.26, 706.6, 727, 727.1, 727.4, 4094.2, 4096, 4096.5, 11253.45, 11400, 11402, 11460, 11461, 11461.2, 11462, 11462.01, 11462.02, 11462.04, 11462.041, 11463, 11465, 11466, 11466.2, 11466.21, 11466.22, 11466.24, 11466.25, 11466.31, 11466.32, 11468, 11469, 16000, 16501,16501.1, 16504.5, 16514, 16519.5, 16519.55, 16519.6, 18250, 18251, 18254, and 18358.30 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 11462.06 of, to add Sections 11466.01, 16519.61, and 16519.62 to, to add the heading of Article 2 (commencing with Section 16519.5) to Chapter 5 of Part 4 of Division 9 of, to add the heading of Article 3 (commencing with Section 16520) to Chapter 5 of Part 4 of Division 9 of, to repeal Sections 11463.01 and 11463.1 of, and to repeal and add Sections 11402.01 and 16519.51 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster care.
Title
Foster care.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1997 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1997 Mark Stone By McGuire (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1997 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1997 Mark Stone By McGuire (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1997 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 612, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6452.). |
2016-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5370.). |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2016-06-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5095.) |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2016-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |