CA AB1997 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-02 - Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-02 - Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6377.1 of, and to add and repeal Sections 17053.83 and 23623.3 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Sales and use taxes: exemptions: unmanned aerial vehicle manufacturing: income taxes: credits: hiring.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeff Gorell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.83 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23623.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6377.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |