CA AB1995 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 49550 of the Education Code, relating to pupil nutrition.
Title
Pupil nutrition: reduced-price meals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 27. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49550 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1995 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1995 |