CA AB1995 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2790 and 9500 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Local publicly owned electric and gas utilities: weatherization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2018-02-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2790 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 9500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1995 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1995 |