CA AB199 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1181.1 to the Civil Code, and to add the heading of Article 1 (commencing with Section 8200) to, and to add Article 2 (commencing with Section 8231) to, Chapter 3 of Division 1 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, relating to notaries public.
Title
California Online Notary Act of 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2019-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1181.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 8200 | New Code | See Bill Text |